Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giulio (Giovanni Michele) Pignatelli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1732BornNapoli
5 Jan 175522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Dec 176634.8SelectedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
16 Feb 176734.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
24 Feb 176734.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
20 May 178452.2SelectedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
20 Jun 178452.2ResignedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
25 Jun 178452.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
17 Aug 179664.4DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio (Giovanni Michele) Pignatelli:
Archbishop Giulio (Giovanni Michele) Pignatelli O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1779
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 238, and Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 10 Dec 2015