Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Boscarini

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1730Born
12 Jun 175625.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 178251.9AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
29 Sep 178251.9Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
9 Sep 180170.8DiedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Boscarini
Bishop Pietro Boscarini (born , died ) Bishop of CittÓ di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 167
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,782, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast