Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Paoli

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1738BornCingoli
16 May 176123.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 177941.3AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
21 Sep 177941.3Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
12 May 180062.0AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
28 Sep 1806³68.3DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felice Paoli:
Bishop Felice Paoli (born , died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Apr 2014