Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michelangelo della Peruta

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1733Born
18 Dec 175623.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 176935.8AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
27 Aug 176935.8Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
30 Oct 180673.0DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo della Peruta
Bishop Michelangelo della Peruta (born , died ) Bishop of Isernia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Nicola la Strada

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 8
  • b/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast