Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Antonio Riccardini, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1723BornMonte San Pietrangeli
20 Nov 174622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
4 Mar 177147.2AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
10 Mar 177147.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
18 Sep 177551.8ResignedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
7 Jul 178258.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

Note(s): ⁶ Before ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Antonio Riccardini:
Bishop Giacomo Antonio Riccardini O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicopoli

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 310
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015