Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Capece

Deceased

Bishop of Oria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1731Born
18 Sep 175625.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Nov 176938.5SelectedBishop of Oria, Italy
12 Mar 177038.8ConfirmedBishop of Oria, Italy
19 Mar 177038.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
Nov 1770³39.4DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Capece
Bishop Giovanni Capece (born , died Nov 1770) Bishop of Oria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarbarano

  • a priest for 14.1 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 427
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast