Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Maria Cardinal Locatelli

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1727Born
18 Mar 175225.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 177245.2AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
8 Jun 177245.2Ordained BishopBishop of Spoleto, Italy
23 Feb 180174.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
17 Jan 180375.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Mar 180376.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
13 Feb 181183.9DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Locatelli
Francesco Maria Cardinal Locatelli (born , died ) Bishop of Spoleto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesena

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
  • a cardinal for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 386
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Feb 1801
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast