Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe D’Anisi (Dalla Croce), O.A.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gallipoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1740BornCastellaneta
24 Feb 176322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Agostiniani Scalzi
27 Feb 179251.9AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
4 Mar 179251.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
13 Dec 182080.7DiedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giuseppe D’Anisi (Dalla Croce):
Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe D’Anisi (Dalla Croce) O.A.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Gallipoli

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014