Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomás de Azpuru Ximénez

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1713³Born
3 Jun 175339.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 177056.3SelectedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
12 Mar 177056.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
24 Jun 177056.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
7 Jul 177258.8DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás de Azpuru Ximénez
Archbishop Tomás de Azpuru Ximénez (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza

  • a priest for 19.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 430
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 87, Number 442
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast