Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Greco

Deceased

Bishop of Belcastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1739BornCotrone
18 Sep 176223.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 179252.3SelectedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
26 Mar 179252.5ConfirmedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
9 Apr 179252.5Ordained BishopBishop of Belcastro, Italy
17 May 180666.6DiedBishop of Belcastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Greco
Bishop Vincenzo Greco (born , died ) Bishop of Belcastro

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 118
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016