Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Paolo de Miceli, C.P.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1744Born
25 Oct 176723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Pious Workers
16 Dec 179147.2SelectedBishop of Alessano, Italy
27 Feb 179247.4ConfirmedBishop of Alessano, Italy
4 Mar 179247.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alessano, Italy
29 Oct 180460.1AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
22 Oct 181369.1DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Paolo de Miceli
Archbishop Gaetano Paolo de Miceli C.P.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLombardi

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 75
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 325
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast