Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Vigliarolo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

Titular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1709¹BornStilo, Italy
30 May 173324.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 176859.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
14 Mar 176859.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
20 Mar 176859.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
1780¹71.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vigliarolo:
Bishop Antonio Vigliarolo Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013