Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Marra

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1742BornReggio
1 Jun 176523.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 179249.7SelectedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
27 Feb 179249.8ConfirmedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
4 Mar 179249.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera, Italy
16 Jan 181673.7DiedBishop of Nicotera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Marra
Bishop Giuseppe Marra (born , died ) Bishop of Nicotera

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 311
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016