Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Gagliardi

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1710Born
30 May 173323.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 176757.1AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
12 Jul 176757.1Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
1 Jul 177868.1DiedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Gagliardi
Bishop Carlo Gagliardi (born , died ) Bishop of Muro Lucano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBella

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,767, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast