Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Amici

Deceased

Archbishop of Camerino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1735BornCamerino
20 May 175822.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 176833.0AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
20 Jun 176833.0AppointedBishop of Fabriano, Italy
24 Jun 176833.0Ordained BishopBishop of Camerino, Italy
8 Jul 178550.0ResignedBishop of Fabriano, Italy
17 Dec 178752.4AppointedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
5 Jul 179560.0DiedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Amici:
Archbishop Luigi Amici (born , died ) Archbishop of Camerino

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013