Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Palica, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bisceglie, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1731Born
29 Mar 175524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Feb 179260.8SelectedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
26 Mar 179261.0ConfirmedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
9 Apr 179261.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
1800¹68.7DiedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Palica
Bishop Salvatore Palica O.S.B. (born , died 1800) Bishop of Bisceglie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarletta

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 442
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast