Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Continisi

Deceased

Bishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1722³BornAltamura
17 Dec 174624.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 177654.4SelectedBishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
16 Dec 177654.5ConfirmedBishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
21 Dec 177654.5Ordained BishopBishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
May 1810³87.9DiedBishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Continisi:
Bishop Michele Continisi (born , died May 1810) Bishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1791
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 247
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015