Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Zunica

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1715BornLucera
30 May 173823.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 177661.5SelectedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
16 Dec 177661.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
21 Dec 177661.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
16 Dec 179681.5DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Zunica:
Archbishop Francesco Zunica (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 64
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015