Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolaus Difnico

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1715BornSibenik
20 Dec 173823.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 176751.9AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
7 Jun 176751.9Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
28 Jun 178368.0DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Difnico:
Bishop Nicolaus Difnico (born , died ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015