Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Potenza

Deceased

Bishop of Sarno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1722BornMarsiconuovo
12 Jun 174523.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 177856.2SelectedBishop of Ariano, Italy
1 Jun 177856.4ConfirmedBishop of Ariano, Italy
7 Jun 177856.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
16 Dec 179169.9SelectedBishop of Sarno, Italy
26 Mar 179270.2ConfirmedBishop of Sarno, Italy
1 Sep 181189.6DiedBishop of Sarno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Potenza:
Bishop Lorenzo Potenza (born , died ) Bishop of Sarno

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 100, and Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013