Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignazio Reali

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Athenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1695BornRoma
5 Oct 172126.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 176671.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
5 Oct 176671.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
8 Dec 176772.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Athenae

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Reali:
Archbishop Ignazio Reali (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Athenae

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013