Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Duca

Deceased

Bishop of Castro di Puglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1734BornAlessano
28 Aug 175723.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 179257.7SelectedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
26 Mar 179257.8ConfirmedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
9 Apr 179257.8Ordained BishopBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
11 Sep 181076.2DiedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Duca
Bishop Francesco Antonio Duca (born , died ) Bishop of Castro di Puglia

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1808
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 154
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016