Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Gonnelli

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1737BornTuri
19 Oct 176022.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 179254.2SelectedBishop of Venosa, Italy
18 Jun 179254.5ConfirmedBishop of Venosa, Italy
24 Jun 179254.5Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
23 Sep 180163.8DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Gonnelli
Bishop Salvatore Gonnelli (born , died ) Bishop of Venosa

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 437
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 74
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1796, Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016