Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Lupoli

Deceased

Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1737BornFratta Maggiore
20 Sep 176022.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 179254.3AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
4 Mar 179254.3Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
1 Jan 180062.2DiedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Lupoli:
Bishop Vincenzo Lupoli (born , died ) Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013