Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele de Angelis

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1740BornNapoli
7 Apr 176423.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 179251.6SelectedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
18 Jun 179251.9ConfirmedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
24 Jun 179251.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
10 Oct 180666.2DiedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele de Angelis
Bishop Michele de Angelis (born , died ) Bishop of Gravina (di Puglia)

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795, Page 89
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 229
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016