Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Mormile, C.R. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1732BornNapoli
21 Dec 175523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
15 Feb 179259.2SelectedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
26 Mar 179259.3ConfirmedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
9 Apr 179259.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
22 Feb 180168.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Mormile
Archbishop Giuseppe Mormile C.R. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 303
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016