Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Davoust, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Ceramus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1728BornMayenne, France
22 Sep 175325.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
24 Sep 177143.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
24 Sep 177143.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
6 Oct 177143.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
18 Jul 178051.8SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
17 Aug 178960.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean Davoust:
Bishop Jean Davoust M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 160

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013