Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Antonio d’Alessandria

Deceased

Bishop of Cariati e Cerenzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1745BornMonteleone
10 Mar 177024.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 179246.6SelectedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
26 Mar 179246.8ConfirmedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
9 Apr 179246.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
18 Jan 180256.6DiedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Antonio d’Alessandria
Bishop Felice Antonio d’Alessandria (born , died ) Bishop of Cariati e Cerenzia

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 148
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016