Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Nicodemi

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1718BornPenta
27 May 174123.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 177153.2AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
4 Aug 177153.2Ordained BishopBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
16 Dec 179173.6SelectedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
26 Mar 179273.9ConfirmedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
2 Mar 180889.8DiedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Nicodemi:
Bishop Carlo Nicodemi (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1788
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 84, and Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013