Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Corrado Panzini

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1732BornMelfi
20 Sep 175523.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 179259.4SelectedBishop of Ugento, Italy
26 Mar 179259.5ConfirmedBishop of Ugento, Italy
9 Apr 179259.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
23 Jul 181178.8DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Corrado Panzini
Bishop Giuseppe Corrado Panzini (born , died ) Bishop of Ugento

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 424
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016