Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ciriaco Vecchioni

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1711Born
19 Jun 173423.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 176756.5AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
21 Dec 176756.5Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
12 Jun 178776.0DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ciriaco Vecchioni
Bishop Ciriaco Vecchioni (born , died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncona

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1786
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 354
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast