Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Nicola de Luca

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trivento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1734BornRipalimosani
20 May 175824.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 177844.5AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
20 Dec 177844.6Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
16 Dec 179157.5SelectedBishop of Trivento, Italy
26 Mar 179257.8ConfirmedBishop of Trivento, Italy
7 Jun 181985.0ResignedBishop of Trivento, Italy
29 Nov 182692.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Nicola de Luca:
Bishop Luca Nicola de Luca (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trivento

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 38
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 298, and Page 418

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015