Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio Maria Palumbo, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1708BornLecce
24 Oct 172315.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
17 Dec 173123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
7 Sep 177263.9AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
13 Sep 177263.9Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
18 Mar 178677.4DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabio Maria Palumbo:
Bishop Fabio Maria Palumbo C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Conversano

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015