Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maria (Giuseppe Caesar Augustus) Vassalli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Lubrense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1739BornNapoli
18 Sep 176222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Feb 179252.3SelectedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
18 Jun 179252.6ConfirmedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
24 Jun 179252.6Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
1797¹57.2DiedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria (Giuseppe Caesar Augustus) Vassalli
Bishop Angelo Maria (Giuseppe Caesar Augustus) Vassalli O.S.B. (born , died 1797) Bishop of Massa Lubrense

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 280
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016