Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Cardamone

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1729Born
23 Dec 175223.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 177848.6AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
25 Jul 177848.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
29 May 180070.5DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Cardamone
Archbishop Andrea Cardamone (born , died ) Archbishop of Rossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTramonti

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 359
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast