Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Berarducci

Deceased

Bishop of Bitonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1716BornBisceglia
12 Mar 174023.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 177053.6AppointedBishop of Bitonto, Italy
3 Jun 177053.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bitonto, Italy
1801¹84.2DiedBishop of Bitonto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orazio Berarducci:
Bishop Orazio Berarducci (born , died 1801) Bishop of Bitonto

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 124
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015