Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Česlao Sipovič, M.I.C. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary

Titular Bishop of Mariamme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1914Born
1 Aug 193318.6EnteredMember of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
15 Aug 193419.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
16 Jun 194025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
2 Jul 196045.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mariamme
4 Aug 196045.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mariamme
2 Jul 196348.5AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
28 Jul 196954.6ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
4 Oct 198166.8DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary

MicroData Summary for Česlao Sipovič (VIAF: 178994477)
Bishop Česlao Sipovič M.I.C. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDziedzinka

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 86
  • accents/c1/prof: CB, 2 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 3 Jan 2018