Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Karol Dowgiałło Zawisza

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹Born
16 Oct 165659.7AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
25 Feb 165760.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
9 Mar 166164.1DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Karol Dowgiałło Zawisza (VIAF: 30410064)
Bishop Jan Karol Dowgiałło Zawisza (born 1597, died ) Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Ordained BishopJasna Góra, Monastery, Częstochowa

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 370
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1657, Number 17
  • ob: CB, 27 May 2018
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,707
  • mn/c2/loc: CB, 12 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 13 Sep 2018

Quantcast