Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jonas Boruta, S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1944 Born
6 Aug 198237.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
28 May 199752.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
28 May 199752.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vulturaria
21 Jun 199752.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vulturaria
5 Jan 200257.2AppointedBishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania
18 Sep 201772.9ResignedBishop of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Jonas Boruta (VIAF: 2698710)
Bishop Jonas Boruta S.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Telšiai (-Klaipeda)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarliava
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vilnius, Archdiocese of Vilnius

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Telšiai (-Klaipeda).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,020
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 18 Sep 2017