Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petras Parčevskis

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornVilnius
1627²37.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 163646.6AppointedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
7 Sep 163646.6Ordained BishopBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
9 Dec 164959.9AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
6 Dec 165868.9DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Petras Parčevskis:
Bishop Petras Parčevskis (born 1590, died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 318, and Page 304
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 97, Number 584
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 1 Jul 2015