Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Mikołaj Zgierski

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1653³Born
7 Apr 168127.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Apr 168127.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 169642.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
2 Jan 169642.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
25 Jan 170652.6AppointedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
21 Jul 171057.1AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
6 Dec 171360.5DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Mikołaj Zgierski (VIAF: 3301151778213718130004)
Bishop Jan Mikołaj Zgierski (born , died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZgierscen

  • a priest for 32.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 259, and Page 343
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 359
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 39
  • mn: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast