Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Benedykt Kłągiewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1767³BornIłłukszta
23 Mar 179932.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 May 179932.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 183063.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
15 Mar 183063.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
12 Sep 183063.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
14 Dec 184073.9AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
27 Dec 184174.9DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Benedykt Kłągiewicz (VIAF: 264186010)
Bishop Andrzej Benedykt Kłągiewicz (born , died ) Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 150, and Page 397
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,034
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016