Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Pilchowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Echinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1735BornOlviten
28 Jun 176125.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Jun 176125.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 179559.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
1 Jun 179559.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Echinus
Aug 1798³62.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Echinus
22 Dec 180368.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for David Pilchowski
Bishop David Pilchowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 205, and Page 454
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016