Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Stefan Giedroyć

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1730BornGiedrojcie
1 Oct 175222.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 176333.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
22 Aug 176333.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
12 Feb 176434.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
10 Dec 176434.8SelectedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
22 Apr 176535.2ConfirmedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
14 Feb 177848.0SelectedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
30 Mar 177848.1ConfirmedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
13 May 180272.2DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Jan Stefan Giedroyć:
Bishop Jan Stefan Giedroyć (born , died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,188
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 435, and Page 365
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 438
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015