Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kazimierz Roch Dmochowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1780BornIkaźń
12 Apr 180222.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Jan 180323.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 184060.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
17 Dec 184060.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Meloë in Lycia
29 Jun 184161.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Meloë in Lycia
3 Jul 184868.4AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
24 Jan 185171.0DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Roch Dmochowski:
Archbishop Kazimierz Roch Dmochowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 389
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013