Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henryk Ciereszko

Auxiliary Bishop of Białystok

Titular Bishop of Dices


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1955 BornHermanówka
14 Jun 198125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Białystok, Poland
17 Nov 201257.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Białystok, Poland
17 Nov 201257.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dices
15 Dec 201257.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dices

MicroData Summary for Henryk Ciereszko:
Bishop Henryk Ciereszko (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Białystok

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Białystok.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,614

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015