Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Stefan Pac

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623¹Born
2 Feb 167350.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 167350.6AppointedAdministrator of Vilnius, Lithuania
25 May 168259.3AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
25 Jul 168259.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
8 May 168461.3DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Stefan Pac (VIAF: 102263585)
Bishop Mikołaj Stefan Pac (born 1623, died ) Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlacePremen

  • a priest for 11.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 416
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast