Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernard Cardinal Maciejowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548²Born
1586²38.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 158739.4AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
24 Jan 158840.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
23 May 160052.3AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
9 Jun 160456.4Elevated to Cardinal
7 Jan 160557.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
31 Jul 160658.5AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
19 Jan 160860.0DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Maciejowski (VIAF: 25406955)
Bernard Cardinal Maciejowski (born 1548, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalopolska
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kraków, Diocese of Kraków
Death PlaceKraków, Diocese of Kraków
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Kraków, Diocese of Kraków

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
  • a cardinal for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,499
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 195
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,894
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 229
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 6 Dec 2017