Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Chołoniewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Arathia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1744³BornTartakˇw
20 Dec 176622.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Jun 176722.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 180460.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
20 Aug 180460.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Arathia
181974.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Chołoniewski:
Bishop Andrzej Chołoniewski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 51.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013