Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwik Feliks Zdanowicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1814Born
17 Apr 183722.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Jun 183723.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 188975.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
30 Dec 188975.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
11 May 189075.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
26 Dec 189682.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Ludwik Feliks Zdanowicz (VIAF: 301395830)
Bishop Ludwik Feliks Zdanowicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDatnów, Diocese of Vilnius
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, St Petersbourg

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017